**Middle School Number Sense Lesson 98: Multiplying by 37**

This concept has appeared

**5 times**this year, with a median placement at

**question # 16**.

**Like our Facebook Page (**

**https://www.facebook.com/numberdojo/**

**) if you want to see new number sense posts on your wall. I will reward you with a free concept index or flashcard file of your choice. Thank you!**

**Number Dojo Level: 137**

To solve these problems, it is important to remember that 37 x 3 = 111. So we’ll basically be using the Triple/Third idea (a variation of

**Double/Half**).

**Example 1: 27 x 37 = ___**

- Divide 27 by 3 to get
**9**. Multiply 37 by 3 to get**111**. - 9 x 111 =
**999**.

**Example 2: 37 x 6 = ___**

- Divide 6 by 3 to get
**2**. - 2 x 111 =
**222**.

**Example 3: 37 x 18 = ___**

- Divide 18 by 3 to get
**6**. - 6 x 111 =
**666**.

**Example 4: 37 x 63 = ___**

- Divide 63 by 3 to get
**21**. - 21 x 111 =
**2331**.

**Example 5: 12 x 74 = ___**

- This one is in
**Mult37**in disguise. Use Double/Half first to get**24 x 37**. - Divide 24 by 3 to get
**8**. - 8 x 111 =
**888**.

**Up Next for Middle School: ConvMoney**