**Elementary School Number Sense Lesson 30: Multiplying by 75--variation**

This concept is an extension of

**Mult75**. It appeared

**2 times**this year, with a median placement at

**question # 71**.

**Like our Facebook Page (**

**https://www.facebook.com/numberdojo/**

**) if you want to see new number sense posts on your wall. I will reward you with a free concept index or flashcard file of your choice. Thank you!**

**Number Dojo Level: 93**

There are a couple of different variations of

**Mult75**that I have seen on number sense tests:

- Including decimals
- Multiplying by 37 ½ (which is ½ of 75)

In each case, use 3 x the result of

**Mult25**, and add decimals or use

**Double/Half**as needed. The order of these operations will vary, depending on the question and your personal preference.

**Example 1: 75 x .36 = ___**

- Ignore the decimal for now and use
**Mult25**. 36 ÷ 4 =**9**; 9 x 100 =**900**. - Triple the result. 900 x 3 =
**2700**. - There are 2 decimal places in the question, so move the decimal twice to the left.
- The answer is
**27**.

**Example 2: 32 x 37 ½ = ___**

- Use
**Double/Half**to get 16 x 75. - Use
**Mult25**. 16 ÷ 4 =**4**; 4 x 100 =**400**. - Triple the result. 400 x 3 =
**1200**.

**Example 3: 4.8 x 7.5 = ___**

- Ignore the decimal and use
**Mult25**. 48 ÷ 4 =**12**; 12 x 100 =**1200**. - Triple the result. 1200 x 3 =
**3600**. - There are 2 decimal places in the question, so move the decimal twice to the left.
- The answer is
**36**.

**Example 4: 48 x 37 ½ = ___**

- Use
**Double/Half**to get 24 x 75. - Use
**Mult25**. 24 ÷ 4 =**6**; 4 x 100 =**600**. - Triple the result. 600 x 3 =
**1800**.

**Example 5: 75 x 5.6 = ___**

- Ignore the decimal and use
**Mult25**. 56 ÷ 4 =**14**; 14 x 100 =**1400**. - Triple the result. 1400 x 3 =
**4200**. - There is 1 decimal place in the question, so move the decimal once to the left.
- The answer is
**420**.

**Here's a free worksheet to help you practice Mult75var:**

mult75var.pdf |

**Up Next for Elementary School: Square51-60**